Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Electricity - Net Energy Metering and Virtual Net Energy Metering - Accrual of Net Excess Generation (Net Metering Flexibility Act)
Sponsored by
Senator Feldman
Status
In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a certain eligible customer-generator to accrue net excess generation for an indefinite period; requiring the Public Service Commission to establish a method for calculating the value of certain accrued net excess generation; and requiring that a subscriber of a community solar energy generating system accrue virtual net excess generation in the same manner as a certain eligible customer-generator.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0068
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2023
Legislative Date
1/16/2023
Action
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2023
Legislative Date
1/19/2023
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2023
Legislative Date
1/25/2023
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2023
Legislative Date
1/25/2023
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 3:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2023
Legislative Date
1/25/2023
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2023
Legislative Date
2/06/2023
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2023
Legislative Date
3/01/2023
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 4:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2023
Legislative Date
3/01/2023
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2023
Legislative Date
3/15/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2023
Legislative Date
3/06/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments {533126/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2023
Legislative Date
3/06/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2023
Legislative Date
3/10/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2023
Legislative Date
3/12/2023
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/16/2023 1/16/2023 First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Text - First - Electricity – Net Energy Metering – Accrual of Net Excess Generation (Net Metering Flexibility Act)
Senate 1/19/2023 1/19/2023 Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 1/25/2023 1/25/2023 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/25/2023 1/25/2023 Hearing 1/31 at 3:30 p.m.
Senate 1/25/2023 1/25/2023 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/06/2023 2/06/2023 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/01/2023 3/01/2023 Hearing 3/02 at 4:00 p.m.
Senate 3/01/2023 3/01/2023 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2023 3/15/2023 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 3/15/2023 3/06/2023 Favorable with Amendments {533126/1 Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2023 3/06/2023 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Electricity - Net Energy Metering and Virtual Net Energy Metering - Accrual of Net Excess Generation (Net Metering Flexibility Act)
Senate 3/17/2023 3/10/2023 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2023 3/12/2023 Referred Economic Matters 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 3/21/2023 1:11 PM
Click to return on the top page