Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Medical Records - Fees - Attorneys Representing Patients
Sponsored by
Senators Hettleman and Gile
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Adding an attorney representing a patient to the list of individuals to whom a health care provider is prohibited from charging a fee for providing copies of a medical record that will be used for the purpose of filing a claim regarding or appealing a denial of Social Security disability income or Social Security benefits.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0153
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
8/14/2023
Legislative Date
8/14/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Medical Records - Fees - Attorneys Representing Patients
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2024
Legislative Date
1/15/2024
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2024
Legislative Date
2/12/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2024
Legislative Date
2/08/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2024
Legislative Date
2/08/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Medical Records - Fees - Attorneys Representing Patients
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2024
Legislative Date
2/10/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2024
Legislative Date
2/16/2024
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2024
Legislative Date
3/13/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
52CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2024
Legislative Date
3/13/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/14/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2024
Legislative Date
3/13/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 8/14/2023 8/14/2023 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Medical Records - Fees - Attorneys Representing Patients
Senate 1/15/2024 1/15/2024 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/12/2024 2/12/2024 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 2/13/2024 2/08/2024 Favorable Adopted 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/13/2024 2/08/2024 Second Reading Passed 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Medical Records - Fees - Attorneys Representing Patients
Senate 2/15/2024 2/10/2024 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 26 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/16/2024 2/16/2024 Referred Health and Government Operations 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/16/2024 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/25/2024 3/25/2024 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/26/2024 3/13/2024 Favorable Adopted 52CClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/26/2024 3/13/2024 Second Reading Passed 52CClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/27/2024 3/14/2024 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2024 3/13/2024 Returned Passed 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/8/2024 2:08 PM
Click to return on the top page