Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health - Authorization to Prescribe and Administer Amygdalin - Repeal
Sponsored by
Senator Feldman
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 306
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing certain provisions of law relating to the prescription, administration, and regulation of amygdalin.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/22/2021
Legislative Date
9/22/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health - Authorization to Prescribe and Administer Amygdalin - Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2022
Legislative Date
1/20/2022
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Health - Authorization to Prescribe and Administer Amygdalin - Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2022
Legislative Date
2/19/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
18AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/24/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/20/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2022
Legislative Date
5/12/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 306
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/22/2021 9/22/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Health - Authorization to Prescribe and Administer Amygdalin - Repeal
Senate 1/20/2022 1/20/2022 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/21/2022 2/21/2022 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 2/22/2022 2/17/2022 Favorable Adopted 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/22/2022 2/17/2022 Second Reading Passed 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Health - Authorization to Prescribe and Administer Amygdalin - Repeal
Senate 2/24/2022 2/19/2022 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 31 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/01/2022 2/25/2022 Referred Health and Government Operations 18AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Hearing 3/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2022 3/30/2022 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/30/2022 3/23/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2022 3/24/2022 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/20/2022 Returned Passed 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/12/2022 5/12/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 306
Text - Chapter - Health - Authorization to Prescribe and Administer Amygdalin - Repeal
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:48 PM
Click to return on the top page