Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2013 - Dorchester County - Cambridge Marine Terminal Redevelopment
Sponsored by
Senator Colburn
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 40
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Amending the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2013 to change the grantee of the grant for the Cambridge Marine Terminal Redevelopment grant from the Maryland Economic Development Corporation to the Mayor and City Commission of the City of Cambridge; making the Act an emergency measure; etc.
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0285
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2014
Legislative Date
1/13/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2014
Legislative Date
1/15/2014
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2014
Legislative Date
1/16/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2014
Legislative Date
1/16/2014
Action
Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2014
Legislative Date
1/27/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2014
Legislative Date
1/28/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
14
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2014
Legislative Date
1/28/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
14
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
16
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
18
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2014
Legislative Date
2/11/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2014
Legislative Date
2/11/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2014
Legislative Date
2/13/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (117-4)
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/14/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
26
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/08/2014
Legislative Date
4/08/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 40
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2014 1/13/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/15/2014 1/15/2014 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/16/2014 1/16/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 1/16/2014 1/16/2014 Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/27/2014 1/27/2014 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/28/2014 1/28/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 14
Senate 1/28/2014 1/28/2014 Second Reading Passed 14
Senate 1/30/2014 1/30/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 16
House 1/31/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Appropriations 18
House 1/31/2014 1/31/2014 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/07/2014 2/10/2014 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 2/11/2014 2/11/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 25
House 2/11/2014 2/11/2014 Second Reading Passed 25
House 2/13/2014 2/13/2014 Third Reading Passed (117-4) 27
Senate 2/14/2014 2/14/2014 Returned Passed 26
Post Passage 4/08/2014 4/08/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 40
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page