Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Insurance Administration - Enforcement Authority - Payment of Claims
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Maryland Insurance Administration)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 120
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Maryland Insurance Commissioner to require an insurer that holds a certificate of authority to fulfill the holder's obligations or pay a claim or an amount due instead of, or in addition to, suspending or revoking the certificate; and authorizing the Commissioner, on a finding of a violation of certain provisions of law, to require an insurer, a nonprofit health service plan, or a health maintenance organization to provide to a claimant a certain payment.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/04/2021
Legislative Date
10/04/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2022
Legislative Date
1/08/2022
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {103829/1 Adopted
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2022
Legislative Date
2/19/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
18AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
4/06/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
66AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/12/2022
Legislative Date
4/12/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 120
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/04/2021 10/04/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Maryland Insurance Administration - Enforcement Authority - Payment of Claims
Senate 1/08/2022 1/08/2022 Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/21/2022 2/21/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/22/2022 2/17/2022 Favorable with Amendments {103829/1 Adopted 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/22/2022 2/17/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Insurance Administration - Enforcement Authority - Payment of Claims
Senate 2/24/2022 2/19/2022 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 31 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/01/2022 2/25/2022 Referred Economic Matters 18AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2022 3/16/2022 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2022 4/06/2022 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/06/2022 3/28/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 3/29/2022 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Returned Passed 66AClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/12/2022 4/12/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 120
Text - Chapter - Maryland Insurance Administration - Enforcement Authority - Payment of Claims
Last Updated: 4/26/2022 12:09 PM
Click to return on the top page