Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Calvert County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsored by
Calvert County Senators
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 43
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing and empowering the County Commissioners of Calvert County, from time to time, to borrow not more than $12,650,000 to finance the construction, improvement, or development of specified public facilities in Calvert County, and to effect such borrowing by the issuance and sale of its general obligation bonds; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1184
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2014
Legislative Date
1/14/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2014
Legislative Date
1/15/2014
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2014
Legislative Date
1/27/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2014
Legislative Date
1/27/2014
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
2/03/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
17A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
17A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
19
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
22
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/08/2014
Legislative Date
4/08/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 43
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2014 1/14/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/15/2014 1/15/2014 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/27/2014 1/27/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 1/27/2014 1/27/2014 Hearing 1/29 at 1:45 p.m.
Senate 2/03/2014 2/03/2014 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/03/2014 1/31/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 17A
Senate 2/03/2014 1/31/2014 Second Reading Passed 17A
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 19
House 2/06/2014 2/06/2014 First Reading Appropriations 22
House 3/10/2014 3/10/2014 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2014 4/03/2014 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 63
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Second Reading Passed 63
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 64
Senate 4/05/2014 3/27/2014 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 4/08/2014 4/08/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 43
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page