Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Public Participation Modernization Act
Sponsored by
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee (By Request - Departmental - Environment)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 93
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Department of the Environment to hold certain public meetings and hearings regarding certain licensing, permitting, and regulatory responsibilities using teleconference or Internet-based conferencing technology under certain circumstances; requiring that certain hearings regarding sewage sludge permits be held in accordance with provisions of law regarding public participation rather than with the Administrative Procedure Act; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/04/2021
Legislative Date
10/04/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Environment - Public Participation Modernization Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2022
Legislative Date
1/11/2022
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/01/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/01/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {373920/1 Adopted
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/01/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Environment - Public Participation Modernization Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/21/2022
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (127-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/12/2022
Legislative Date
4/12/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 93
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Environment - Public Participation Modernization Act
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/04/2021 10/04/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Environment - Public Participation Modernization Act
Senate 1/11/2022 1/11/2022 Hearing 1/18 at 2:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/01/2022 2/01/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/01/2022 2/01/2022 Favorable with Amendments {373920/1 Adopted 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/01/2022 2/01/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Environment - Public Participation Modernization Act
Senate 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 17 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 Referred Environment and Transportation 10 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2022 3/21/2022 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2022 4/01/2022 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/01/2022 3/26/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 47AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2022 3/27/2022 Third Reading Passed (127-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2022 3/23/2022 Returned Passed 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/12/2022 4/12/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 93
Text - Chapter - Environment - Public Participation Modernization Act
Last Updated: 4/22/2022 1:47 PM
Click to return on the top page