Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Personnel Records - Investigations of Law Enforcement Officers (Anton's Law)
Sponsored by
Senator Carter
Status
In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Racial and Equity Impact note – 2021 Maryland Police Reform Proposals
Synopsis
Establishing that a certain record relating to an administrative or criminal investigation of misconduct by a law enforcement officer is not a personnel record for purposes of certain provisions of the Public Information Act; establishing that a record of a technical infraction is a personnel record for certain purposes; authorizing a custodian to deny inspection of records relating to an administrative or criminal investigation of misconduct by a law enforcement officer; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0120
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/21/2020
Legislative Date
10/21/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/28/2020
Legislative Date
12/28/2020
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {848971/1
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Smith) Adopted
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/17/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {848971/1 Adopted
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/17/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {663225/1 (Senator Beidle) Rejected (21-26)
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/17/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Ferguson) Adopted
Proceedings
18AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/17/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {633328/1 (Senator West) Rejected (17-30)
Proceedings
18AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/17/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {113327/1 (Senator Bailey) Rejected (21-26)
Proceedings
18AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/17/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
18AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/18/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (29-18)
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/21/2020 10/21/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 12/28/2020 12/28/2020 Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Public Information Act - Personnel Records - Investigations of Law Enforcement Officers (Anton's Law)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2021 2/26/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/26/2021 2/16/2021 Favorable with Amendments {848971/1 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2021 2/16/2021 Motion Laid Over (Senator Smith) Adopted 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2021 2/17/2021 Favorable with Amendments {848971/1 Adopted 18 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2021 2/17/2021 Floor Amendment {663225/1 (Senator Beidle) Rejected (21-26) 18 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2021 2/17/2021 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Ferguson) Adopted 18AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2021 2/17/2021 Floor Amendment {633328/1 (Senator West) Rejected (17-30) 18AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2021 2/17/2021 Floor Amendment {113327/1 (Senator Bailey) Rejected (21-26) 18AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2021 2/17/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 18AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Personnel Records - Investigations of Law Enforcement Officers (Anton's Law)
Senate 3/03/2021 2/18/2021 Third Reading Passed (29-18) 19 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/04/2021 2/28/2021 Referred Judiciary 19 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 3/4/2021 1:53 PM
Click to return on the top page