Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Homeowners’ Property Tax Credit – Application Filing Deadline – Extension
Sponsored by
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee (By Request - Departmental - Assessments and Taxation)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 131
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the State Department of Assessments and Taxation to accept an application for the homeowners' property tax credit submitted by a homeowner within 1 year after April 15 of the taxable year for which the credit is sought if the homeowner is applying for the credit for the first time or has filed a timely application for the credit for the 3 immediately preceding taxable years.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0204
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/04/2021
Legislative Date
10/04/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/07/2022
Legislative Date
1/07/2022
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2022
Legislative Date
1/10/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2022
Legislative Date
1/10/2022
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2022
Legislative Date
1/31/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/01/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/01/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/12/2022
Legislative Date
4/12/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 131
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/04/2021 10/04/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Homeowners’ Property Tax Credit – Application Filing Deadline – Extension
Senate 1/07/2022 1/07/2022 Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/10/2022 1/10/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/10/2022 1/10/2022 Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/31/2022 1/31/2022 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/01/2022 2/01/2022 Favorable Adopted 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/01/2022 2/01/2022 Second Reading Passed 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Homeowners’ Property Tax Credit – Application Filing Deadline – Extension
Senate 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 17 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 Referred Ways and Means 10 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/01/2022 3/01/2022 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/15/2022 3/15/2022 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2022 3/30/2022 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/30/2022 3/22/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2022 3/23/2022 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Returned Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/12/2022 4/12/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 131
Text - Chapter - Homeowners’ Property Tax Credit – Application Filing Deadline – Extension
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:49 PM
Click to return on the top page