Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Law Enforcement - Wellness Checks - Requirements (Gabriel's Law)
Sponsored by
Senator Muse
Status
In the House - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a law enforcement agency that receives a certain request for a wellness check of an individual to conduct a wellness check of the individual within a reasonable amount of time after receiving the request under certain circumstances.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0404
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/26/2023
Legislative Date
9/26/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Law Enforcement - Wellness Checks - Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2024
Legislative Date
1/15/2024
Action
Hearing 1/24 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/18/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {413927/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Law Enforcement - Wellness Checks - Requirements (Gabriel's Law)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/06/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2024
Legislative Date
3/12/2024
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
4/04/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {803723/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/26/2023 9/26/2023 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Law Enforcement - Wellness Checks - Requirements
Senate 1/15/2024 1/15/2024 Hearing 1/24 at 2:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/18/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/18/2024 3/04/2024 Favorable with Amendments {413927/1 Adopted 49AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/04/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Law Enforcement - Wellness Checks - Requirements (Gabriel's Law)
Senate 3/18/2024 3/06/2024 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2024 3/12/2024 Referred Judiciary 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2024 3/20/2024 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2024 4/04/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/04/2024 3/23/2024 Favorable with Amendments {803723/1 Adopted 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2024 3/23/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/4/2024 6:19 PM
Click to return on the top page