Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Department of Commerce - Reporting Requirements and Purple Line Construction Zone Grant Program - Alterations
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Commerce)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 116
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "economic development program" for purposes of certain data collection, tracking, and reporting requirements of the Maryland Jobs Development Act to include certain tax credit programs; altering the purpose of the Purple Line Construction Zone Grant Program; requiring the Department of Commerce to distribute certain funds under the Grant Program in a certain manner; requiring a county that receives funds under the Program to implement a process for awarding grants to qualified small businesses; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/14/2021
Legislative Date
10/14/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2022
Legislative Date
1/08/2022
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2022
Legislative Date
1/24/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2022
Legislative Date
1/25/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {513022/1 Adopted
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2022
Legislative Date
1/25/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/21/2022
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
6 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {813128/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/12/2022
Legislative Date
4/12/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 116
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/14/2021 10/14/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Maryland Department of Commerce - Transparency and Efficiency in Reporting Act
Senate 1/08/2022 1/08/2022 Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/24/2022 1/24/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 1/25/2022 1/25/2022 Favorable with Amendments {513022/1 Adopted 10 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/25/2022 1/25/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 10 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Department of Commerce - Transparency and Efficiency in Reporting Act
Senate 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 12 Click to view Recorded Media
House 1/27/2022 1/21/2022 Referred Ways and Means 6 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/03/2022 3/03/2022 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2022 4/05/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/06/2022 3/28/2022 Favorable with Amendments {813128/1 Adopted 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2022 3/28/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 3/29/2022 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Senate Concurs House Amendments 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Maryland Department of Commerce - Reporting Requirements and Purple Line Construction Zone Grant Program - Alterations
Post Passage 4/12/2022 4/12/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 116
Text - Chapter - Maryland Department of Commerce - Reporting Requirements and Purple Line Construction Zone Grant Program - Alterations
Last Updated: 5/9/2022 2:53 PM
Click to return on the top page