Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - Office of the Sheriff - Duties and Deputy Sheriffs
Sponsored by
Senator Jackson
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing from four to five the number of full-time assistant sheriffs provided to the Sheriff of Prince George's County; providing that the Fraternal Order of Police will negotiate on behalf of deputy sheriffs in benefit matters not related to salary; and clarifying that the Office of the Sheriff of Prince George's County may investigate domestic violence calls and are not required to transfer those investigations to another law enforcement agency.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0433
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2023
Bill imposes a local government mandate, which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2023
Legislative Date
1/20/2023
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2023
Legislative Date
1/24/2023
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2023
Legislative Date
2/22/2023
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2023
Legislative Date
2/24/2023
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2023
Legislative Date
2/24/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2023
Legislative Date
2/25/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2023
Legislative Date
2/27/2023
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2023
Legislative Date
3/22/2023
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2023 1/20/2023 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Prince George's County - Office of the Sheriff - Duties and Deputy Sheriffs
Senate 1/24/2023 1/24/2023 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/22/2023 2/22/2023 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/24/2023 2/24/2023 Favorable Adopted 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/24/2023 2/24/2023 Second Reading Passed 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Prince George's County - Office of the Sheriff - Duties and Deputy Sheriffs
Senate 2/28/2023 2/25/2023 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 34 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/02/2023 2/27/2023 Referred Judiciary 36 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2023 3/22/2023 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 3/22/2023 3:26 PM
Click to return on the top page