Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment – PFAS Chemicals – Prohibitions and Requirements
Sponsored by
Senators Elfreth and Beidle
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 11:00 a.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Prohibiting, on or after January 1, 2022, a person from using, manufacturing, or knowingly selling or distributing certain fire-fighting foam that contains intentionally added PFAS chemicals in the State; prohibiting, on or after January 1, 2022, a person from manufacturing, selling, or distributing a certain rug or carpet in the State; prohibiting, on or after January 1, 2022, a manufacturer or distributor from manufacturing, selling, or distributing certain food packaging in the State; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0022
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/13/2020
Legislative Date
10/13/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Environment – PFAS Chemicals – Prohibitions and Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2021
Legislative Date
1/06/2021
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 10/13/2020 10/13/2020 Pre-filed
Text - First - Environment – PFAS Chemicals – Prohibitions and Requirements
Senate 1/06/2021 1/06/2021 Hearing 1/28 at 11:00 a.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/12/2021 12:20 PM