Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Examiners in Optometry - Sunset Extension
Sponsored by
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee (By Request - Departmental - Health)
Status
In the Senate - Senate Requests House Recede
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Continuing the State Board of Examiners in Optometry in accordance with the provisions of the Maryland Program Evaluation Act (sunset law) by extending until July 1, 2025, the termination provisions relating to the statutory and regulatory authority of the Board.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/05/2021
Legislative Date
10/05/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Board of Examiners in Optometry - Sunset Extension
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2022
Legislative Date
1/11/2022
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/01/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/01/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {613926/1 Adopted
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/01/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Board of Examiners in Optometry - Sunset Extension
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {703425/1 Adopted
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
72 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
72 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/05/2021 10/05/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - State Board of Examiners in Optometry - Sunset Extension
Senate 1/11/2022 1/11/2022 Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/01/2022 2/01/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/01/2022 2/01/2022 Favorable with Amendments {613926/1 Adopted 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/01/2022 2/01/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Board of Examiners in Optometry - Sunset Extension
Senate 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 17 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 Referred Health and Government Operations 10 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Favorable with Amendments {703425/1 Adopted 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/01/2022 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 72 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/01/2022 Senate Requests House Recede 72 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:50 PM
Click to return on the top page