Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Wills - Execution of Wills - Witnesses and Wills Executed Outside the State
Sponsored by
Senator Lee
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 323
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting, for purposes of an attested will, a person from qualifying as a witness in the presence of the testator if the witness is in a different physical location than the testator; clarifying the conditions under which a will executed outside the State is properly executed; and providing for the prospective application of the Act.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2019
Legislative Date
1/24/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Estates and Trusts - Execution of Wills - Presence of Witnesses
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {998074/1 Adopted
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Estates and Trusts - Execution of Wills - Presence of Witnesses
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/17/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {966484/1 Adopted
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/17/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (128-0)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 323
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2019 1/24/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Estates and Trusts - Execution of Wills - Presence of Witnesses
Senate 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 Hearing 2/06 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Favorable with Amendments {998074/1 Adopted 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Estates and Trusts - Execution of Wills - Presence of Witnesses
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Referred Health and Government Operations 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2019 3/21/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/22/2019 3/17/2019 Favorable with Amendments {966484/1 Adopted 52 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2019 3/17/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/25/2019 3/18/2019 Third Reading Passed (128-0) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Senate Concurs House Amendments 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Wills - Execution of Wills - Witnesses and Wills Executed Outside the State
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 323
Text - Chapter - Wills - Execution of Wills - Witnesses and Wills Executed Outside the State
(   4-102, 4-104 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page