Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws – Driver’s Licenses and Identification Cards – Temporary Renewal
Sponsored by
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee (By Request - Departmental - Transportation)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 119
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Motor Vehicle Administration to issue a temporary renewal for a driver's license or identification card for a period not exceeding 2 years for certain applicants.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/30/2021
Legislative Date
9/30/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/05/2022
Legislative Date
1/05/2022
Action
Hearing 1/13 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2022
Legislative Date
1/26/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/01/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
9 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/21/2022
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (127-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/12/2022
Legislative Date
4/12/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 119
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/30/2021 9/30/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Vehicle Laws – Driver’s Licenses and Identification Cards – Temporary Renewal
Senate 1/05/2022 1/05/2022 Hearing 1/13 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/26/2022 1/26/2022 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 Favorable Adopted 12 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 Second Reading Passed 12 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws – Driver’s Licenses and Identification Cards – Temporary Renewal
Senate 2/01/2022 2/01/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 15 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Referred Environment and Transportation 9 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2022 3/21/2022 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2022 4/01/2022 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/01/2022 3/26/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 47AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2022 3/27/2022 Third Reading Passed (127-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2022 3/23/2022 Returned Passed 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/12/2022 4/12/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 119
Text - Chapter - Vehicle Laws – Driver’s Licenses and Identification Cards – Temporary Renewal
Last Updated: 4/22/2022 1:59 PM
Click to return on the top page