Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of the Environment – Enforcement Authority
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Office of the Attorney General)
Status
In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of the Environment to notify the Attorney General each time the Department initiates a certain administrative action; altering the enforcement authority of the Department under various provisions of law, including provisions relating to waterway construction and dam safety, tidal and nontidal wetlands, drinking water, and waterworks, wastewater works, and industrial wastewater works; requiring a person or municipal or private corporation to report certain information to the Department annually; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0402
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Department of the Environment – Enforcement Authority
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2022
Legislative Date
1/20/2022
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/17/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {683824/1
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/06/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {683824/1
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/06/2022
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/06/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Ready) Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {263827/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (15-31)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {953828/1 (Senator West) Rejected (22-24)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Griffith) Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Senator Griffith) Adopted
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {633329/1 (Senator West) Adopted
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Department of the Environment – Enforcement Authority
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-15)
Proceedings
50AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Department of the Environment – Enforcement Authority
Senate 1/20/2022 1/20/2022 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2022 3/17/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2022 3/05/2022 Favorable with Amendments {683824/1 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2022 3/05/2022 Motion Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/06/2022 Favorable with Amendments {683824/1 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/06/2022 Committee Amendment Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/06/2022 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Ready) Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/07/2022 Favorable with Amendments Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/07/2022 Floor Amendment {263827/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (15-31) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/07/2022 Floor Amendment {953828/1 (Senator West) Rejected (22-24) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/07/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/08/2022 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Griffith) Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/09/2022 Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Senator Griffith) Adopted 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/09/2022 Floor Amendment {633329/1 (Senator West) Adopted 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/09/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Department of the Environment – Enforcement Authority
Senate 3/21/2022 3/10/2022 Third Reading Passed (32-15) 50AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2022 3/16/2022 Referred Environment and Transportation 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/6/2022 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page