Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Corps Program – Revisions
Sponsored by
Senators Ferguson, Hettleman, Ellis, Hester, Kagan, Lam, and Pinsky
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 37
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering certain purposes of the Maryland Corps Program by allowing participants to transition to the workforce as well as to higher education institutions; requiring that Program funds be used to expand the Chesapeake Conservation Corps and the Maryland Conservation Corps and create a Maryland Civilian Climate Corps and a Maryland Historic Trades Corp; restructuring the Board as a body politic and corporate and as an instrumentality of the State; requiring the Board to prioritize certain individuals for participation in the Program; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0443
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Corps Program – Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2022
Legislative Date
1/17/2022
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2022
Legislative Date
1/19/2022
Action
Hearing canceled (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2022
Legislative Date
1/24/2022
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) and Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/01/2022
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) and Hearing canceled (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {673226/1 Adopted
Proceedings
33BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {263920/1 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted
Proceedings
33BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
33BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Corps Program – Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/23/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:40 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/21/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {113221/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/21/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (105-28)
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Maryland Corps Program – Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/09/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 37
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Maryland Corps Program – Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Maryland Corps Program – Revisions
Senate 1/17/2022 1/17/2022 Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Senate 1/19/2022 1/19/2022 Hearing canceled (Budget and Taxation)
Senate 1/24/2022 1/24/2022 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Senate 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) and Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Senate 2/01/2022 2/01/2022 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) and Hearing canceled (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/28/2022 2/28/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/01/2022 2/21/2022 Favorable with Amendments {673226/1 Adopted 33BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/01/2022 2/21/2022 Floor Amendment {263920/1 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted 33BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/01/2022 2/21/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 33BClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Corps Program – Revisions
Senate 3/03/2022 2/23/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 35 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/04/2022 2/28/2022 Referred Appropriations 21 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2022 3/13/2022 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing canceled
House 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 3/22 at 1:40 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2022 3/29/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/29/2022 3/21/2022 Favorable with Amendments {113221/1 Adopted 42AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2022 3/21/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2022 3/23/2022 Third Reading Passed (105-28) 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Senate Concurs House Amendments 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Maryland Corps Program – Revisions
Post Passage 4/09/2022 4/09/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 37
Text - Chapter - Maryland Corps Program – Revisions
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:50 PM
Click to return on the top page