Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations - Service Members, Veterans, and Military Spouses - Temporary Licensure, Certification, Registration, and Permitting
Sponsored by
Senators Jackson, Hester, and Carozza
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring health occupations boards to issue an expedited temporary license, certificate, registration, or permit to a service member, veteran, or military spouse who meets certain requirements; requiring each health occupations board to include a check-off box prominently on each license, certification, or registration application form; requiring the Maryland Department of Health to publish prominently certain information on its website; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0112
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2022
Legislative Date
1/13/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2022
Legislative Date
1/20/2022
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {273720/1 Adopted
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2022
Legislative Date
2/24/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2022 1/13/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Health Occupations - Service Members, Veterans, and Military Spouses - Temporary Licensure, Certification, Registration, and Permitting
Senate 1/20/2022 1/20/2022 Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/01/2022 3/01/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/02/2022 2/22/2022 Favorable with Amendments {273720/1 Adopted 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2022 2/22/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Health Occupations - Service Members, Veterans, and Military Spouses - Temporary Licensure, Certification, Registration, and Permitting
Senate 3/04/2022 2/24/2022 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2022 3/01/2022 Referred Health and Government Operations 22 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
(   1-701,   1-702.1, 1-702.2 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:50 PM
Click to return on the top page