Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Work Search Requirement - Exemption for Federal Civilian Employees During a Federal Government Shutdown
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Labor)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 103
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Secretary of Labor to exempt a federal civilian employee who has been furloughed from the requirement to be actively seeking work for unemployment insurance benefits eligibility if, during the furlough, the employee remains able to work, available for work, and work-attached.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0197
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/28/2023
Legislative Date
9/28/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2024
Legislative Date
3/11/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
2/27/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
2/27/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/01/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (34-11)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2024
Legislative Date
3/15/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2024
Legislative Date
3/15/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
3/18/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (105-32)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/17/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2024
Legislative Date
4/09/2024
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 103
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/28/2023 9/28/2023 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Unemployment Insurance - Work Search Requirement - Exemption for Federal Civilian Employees During a Federal Government Shutdown
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2024 3/11/2024 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/12/2024 2/27/2024 Favorable Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2024 2/27/2024 Second Reading Passed 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Unemployment Insurance - Work Search Requirement - Exemption for Federal Civilian Employees During a Federal Government Shutdown
Senate 3/14/2024 3/01/2024 Third Reading Passed (34-11) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2024 3/05/2024 Referred Economic Matters 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2024 3/28/2024 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/28/2024 3/15/2024 Favorable Adopted 54 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2024 3/15/2024 Second Reading Passed 54 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2024 3/18/2024 Third Reading Passed (105-32) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2024 3/17/2024 Returned Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/09/2024 4/09/2024 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 103
Last Updated: 4/9/2024 3:04 PM
Click to return on the top page