Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
St. Mary's County - Public and Nonpublic Schools - Prohibition on Possession of Tobacco Products by Minors
Sponsored by
Senator Bailey
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a minor from possessing a tobacco product in a school building or on school grounds of a public, charter, and nonpublic school in St. Mary's County; and establishing penalties for violating this prohibition for a first offense, attendance at a tobacco cessation program, for a second offense, a civil penalty of up to $50 and for a third and subsequent violations, a civil penalty of up to $100 for each violation.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0526
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
7/28/2020
Legislative Date
7/28/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/29/2020
Legislative Date
12/29/2020
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2021
Legislative Date
1/06/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2021
Legislative Date
1/06/2021
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 7/28/2020 7/28/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 12/29/2020 12/29/2020 Hearing 1/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Text - First - St. Mary's County - Public and Nonpublic Schools - Prohibition on Possession of Tobacco Products by Minors
Senate 1/06/2021 1/06/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/06/2021 1/06/2021 Hearing 1/20 at 3:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
(   26-105 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:10 PM
Click to return on the top page