Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance - Protection of Contributor
Sponsored by
Senator Simonaire
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 264
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from using contributor information from any report or statement required under provisions of law governing campaign finance for commercial solicitation purposes; and prohibiting a person from publishing contributor information from any report or statement required under provisions of law governing campaign finance in newspapers, magazines, books, websites, or other similar media for the purpose of facilitating commercial solicitation.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0296 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2022
Legislative Date
1/13/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Election Law - Campaign Finance - Protection of Contributor
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2022
Legislative Date
1/13/2022
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2022
Legislative Date
1/13/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2022
Legislative Date
1/13/2022
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/08/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/08/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/08/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Election Law - Campaign Finance - Protection of Contributor
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
14 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (122-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2022
Legislative Date
5/12/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 264
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2022 1/13/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Election Law - Campaign Finance - Protection of Contributor
Senate 1/13/2022 1/13/2022 Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/13/2022 1/13/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/13/2022 1/13/2022 Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/08/2022 2/08/2022 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/08/2022 2/08/2022 Favorable Adopted 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/08/2022 2/08/2022 Second Reading Passed 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Election Law - Campaign Finance - Protection of Contributor
Senate 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 22 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/17/2022 2/17/2022 Referred Ways and Means 14 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/01/2022 3/01/2022 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/15/2022 3/15/2022 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2022 3/31/2022 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/01/2022 3/26/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 47AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2022 3/27/2022 Third Reading Passed (122-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2022 3/23/2022 Returned Passed 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/12/2022 5/12/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 264
(   13-106 )
Last Updated: 5/12/2022 3:02 PM
Click to return on the top page