Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Examiners in Optometry – Sunset Extension
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Health)
Status
In the House - First Reading Health and Government Operations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Continuing the State Board of Examiners in Optometry in accordance with the provisions of the Maryland Program Evaluation Act (sunset law) by extending to July 1, 2028, the termination provisions relating to the statutory and regulatory authority of the Board.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/08/2023
Legislative Date
9/08/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2024
Legislative Date
1/08/2024
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Board of Examiners in Optometry – Sunset Extension
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2024
Legislative Date
1/29/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2024
Legislative Date
1/30/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2024
Legislative Date
1/30/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Board of Examiners in Optometry – Sunset Extension
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2024
Legislative Date
2/01/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/07/2024
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/08/2023 9/08/2023 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/08/2024 1/08/2024 Hearing 1/18 at 2:00 p.m.
Text - First - State Board of Examiners in Optometry – Sunset Extension
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/29/2024 1/29/2024 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 1/30/2024 1/30/2024 Favorable Adopted 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/30/2024 1/30/2024 Second Reading Passed 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Board of Examiners in Optometry – Sunset Extension
Senate 2/01/2024 2/01/2024 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 17 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/07/2024 2/07/2024 Referred Health and Government Operations 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/7/2024 11:39 AM
Click to return on the top page