Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Self-Measured Blood Pressure Monitoring
Sponsored by
Senator Feldman
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 670
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring, beginning January 1, 2023, the Maryland Medical Assistance Program to provide coverage for self-measured blood pressure monitoring.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0534
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2022
Legislative Date
1/14/2022
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2022
Legislative Date
1/21/2022
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/11/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-0)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
74 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 670
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/14/2022 1/14/2022 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Self-Measured Blood Pressure Monitoring
Senate 1/21/2022 1/21/2022 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2022 3/30/2022 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/30/2022 3/18/2022 Favorable Adopted 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2022 3/18/2022 Second Reading Passed 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Self-Measured Blood Pressure Monitoring
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2022 3/25/2022 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/11/2022 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/05/2022 Third Reading Passed (130-0) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Returned Passed 74 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 670
Text - Chapter - Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Self-Measured Blood Pressure Monitoring
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:51 PM
Click to return on the top page