Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Minority Business Enterprises – Calculation of Participation Rates – Procurements From Maryland Correctional Enterprises
Sponsored by
Senator Hayes
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/25 at 2:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a State procurement unit to include the dollar value of its contracts with Maryland Correctional Enterprises in the total dollar value of its procurements for the purpose of calculating the unit's Minority Business Enterprise Program participation rate.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0450
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0635 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2022
Legislative Date
1/14/2022
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2022
Legislative Date
1/17/2022
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2022
Legislative Date
1/21/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2022
Legislative Date
1/21/2022
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/14/2022 1/14/2022 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Minority Business Enterprises – Calculation of Participation Rates – Procurements From Maryland Correctional Enterprises
Senate 1/17/2022 1/17/2022 Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Senate 1/21/2022 1/21/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/21/2022 1/21/2022 Hearing 1/25 at 2:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/26/2022 4:16 PM
Click to return on the top page