Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Energy Administration – Resiliency Hub Grant Program and Fund
Sponsored by
Senator Beidle
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 735
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Resiliency Hub Grant Program in the Maryland Energy Administration to develop resiliency hubs that serve low- and moderate-income households at no cost to the households; defining "resiliency hub" as a location where solar photovoltaic and battery energy storage are designed to provide electricity during extended grid outages; requiring the Administration to establish certain procedures and criteria for the Program; requiring that certain fines and penalties be credited to a certain fund; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0031
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2022
Legislative Date
1/14/2022
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2022
Legislative Date
1/17/2022
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {263922/1 Adopted
Proceedings
33BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
33BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/23/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (98-39)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 735
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/14/2022 1/14/2022 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Maryland Energy Administration – Resiliency Hub Grant Program and Fund
Senate 1/17/2022 1/17/2022 Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/28/2022 2/28/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/01/2022 2/21/2022 Favorable with Amendments {263922/1 Adopted 33BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/01/2022 2/21/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 33BClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Energy Administration – Resiliency Hub Grant Program and Fund
Senate 3/03/2022 2/23/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 35 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/04/2022 2/28/2022 Referred Economic Matters 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/07/2022 3/29/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Third Reading Passed (98-39) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Returned Passed 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 735
Text - Chapter - Maryland Energy Administration – Resiliency Hub Grant Program and Fund
(   9-2010, 9-2011, 9-20B-05   )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:51 PM
Click to return on the top page