Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Paint Stewardship
Sponsored by
Senators West, Elfreth, Brooks, and Lewis Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring producers of architectural paint or a representative organization to submit a plan for the establishment of a Paint Stewardship Program to the Department of the Environment on or before July 1, 2024, and in accordance with certain requirements; requiring the Department to review and approve certain plans, including a certain assessment, submitted in accordance with the Paint Stewardship Program; prohibiting the sale of certain architectural paint under certain circumstances beginning January 1, 2025; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0255
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0143 Session: 2022 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2023
Legislative Date
1/25/2023
Action
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2023
Legislative Date
1/25/2023
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Paint Stewardship
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2023 1/25/2023 First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 1/25/2023 1/25/2023 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Maryland Paint Stewardship
Last Updated: 2/10/2023 11:08 AM
Click to return on the top page