Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health - Food Service Facilities - Beverage Options With Children's Meals
Sponsored by
Senator Beidle
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a food service facility that offers children's meals to offer certain water, milk or a nondairy milk alternative, or a beverage consisting of 8 ounces or less of 100% fruit or vegetable juice combined with water or sparkling water, with no added natural or artificial sweeteners, as the default beverages included with the meal.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0661
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2022
Legislative Date
1/14/2022
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2022
Legislative Date
1/14/2022
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {963727/1
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Beidle) Adopted
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2022
Legislative Date
2/18/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2022
Legislative Date
2/18/2022
Action
Committee Amendment {963727/1 Withdrawn
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2022
Legislative Date
2/18/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2022
Legislative Date
2/18/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {953728/1 (Senator Beidle) Adopted
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2022
Legislative Date
2/18/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2022
Legislative Date
2/20/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (31-14)
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
18AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
4/06/2022
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/14/2022 1/14/2022 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/14/2022 1/14/2022 Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Health - Food Service Facilities - Beverage Options With Children's Meals
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/21/2022 2/21/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/22/2022 2/17/2022 Favorable with Amendments {963727/1 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/22/2022 2/17/2022 Motion Laid Over (Senator Beidle) Adopted 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/23/2022 2/18/2022 Favorable with Amendments 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/23/2022 2/18/2022 Committee Amendment {963727/1 Withdrawn 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/23/2022 2/18/2022 Favorable Adopted 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/23/2022 2/18/2022 Floor Amendment {953728/1 (Senator Beidle) Adopted 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/23/2022 2/18/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Health - Food Service Facilities - Beverage Options With Children's Meals
Senate 2/25/2022 2/20/2022 Third Reading Passed (31-14) 32 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/01/2022 2/25/2022 Referred Economic Matters 18AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2022 4/06/2022 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   21-330.3 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:51 PM
Click to return on the top page