Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Higher Education Commission - Access to Mental Health Advisory Committee - Establishment
Sponsored by
Senators Jackson, Augustine, Brooks, Feldman, Hester, Kagan, and Lewis Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Access to Mental Health Advisory Committee within the Maryland Higher Education Commission; requiring the staff for the Committee to be provided on a rotating basis by the institutions of higher education that have members on the Committee; and requiring the Committee to submit a report of its findings and recommendations to the Governor and certain legislative committees of the General Assembly by December 1, 2023.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0573
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0937 Session: 2022 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2023
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2023
Legislative Date
1/25/2023
Action
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2023
Legislative Date
1/25/2023
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2023
Legislative Date
2/20/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2023
Legislative Date
2/21/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments {523722/1 Adopted
Proceedings
30BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2023
Legislative Date
2/21/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2023
Legislative Date
2/24/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2023
Legislative Date
2/24/2023
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
33AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2023
Legislative Date
3/13/2023
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2023 1/25/2023 First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 1/25/2023 1/25/2023 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Maryland Higher Education Commission - Access to Mental Health Advisory Committee - Establishment
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/20/2023 2/20/2023 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 2/21/2023 2/21/2023 Favorable with Amendments {523722/1 Adopted 30BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/21/2023 2/21/2023 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30BClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Higher Education Commission - Access to Mental Health Advisory Committee - Establishment
Senate 2/24/2023 2/24/2023 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/27/2023 2/24/2023 Referred Appropriations 33AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2023 3/13/2023 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
(   11-108 )
Last Updated: 3/18/2023 1:55 PM
Click to return on the top page