Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Crimes - Indecent Exposure - Definition
Sponsored by
Senators Waldstreicher and Augustine
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 331
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Defining the term "indecent exposure" to establish that the offense of indecent exposure prohibits a person from engaging in a certain act of masturbation in public.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0515 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/28/2020
Legislative Date
9/28/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/28/2020
Legislative Date
12/28/2020
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Crimes - Indecent Exposure - Definition
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Crimes - Indecent Exposure - Definition
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/24/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
4/07/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/18/2021
Legislative Date
5/18/2021
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 331
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Crimes - Indecent Exposure - Definition
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/28/2020 9/28/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 12/28/2020 12/28/2020 Hearing 1/19 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Crimes - Indecent Exposure - Definition
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2021 3/09/2021 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/11/2021 2/23/2021 Favorable Adopted 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2021 2/23/2021 Second Reading Passed 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Crimes - Indecent Exposure - Definition
Senate 3/12/2021 2/24/2021 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 25 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2021 3/05/2021 Referred Judiciary 24 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/23/2021 3/23/2021 Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2021 4/07/2021 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/07/2021 3/22/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2021 3/23/2021 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/18/2021 Returned Passed 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/18/2021 5/18/2021 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 331
Text - Chapter - Crimes - Indecent Exposure - Definition
Last Updated: 5/21/2021 12:29 PM
Click to return on the top page