Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment – PFAS Chemicals – Prohibitions and Requirements (George “Walter” Taylor Act)
Sponsored by
Senators Elfreth, Beidle, Lam, and Bailey
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 139
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting, on or after January 1, 2024, a person from using, manufacturing, or knowingly selling or distributing Class B fire-fighting foam that contains intentionally added PFAS chemicals in the State; prohibiting, on or after January 1, 2024, a person from manufacturing or knowingly selling or distributing a certain rug or carpet; prohibiting, on or after January 1, 2024, certain persons from manufacturing or knowingly selling or distributing certain food packaging designed for direct food contact in the State; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0275
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0195 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2022
Legislative Date
1/17/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2022
Legislative Date
1/20/2022
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2022
Legislative Date
2/20/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {193226/1 Adopted
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2022
Legislative Date
2/20/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {953521/1 (Senator Elfreth) Adopted
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2022
Legislative Date
2/20/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
33BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2022
Legislative Date
2/26/2022
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {913720/1 Adopted
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
71 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
71 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/21/2022
Legislative Date
4/21/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 139
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2022 1/17/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Environment – PFAS Chemicals – Prohibitions and Requirements (George “Walter” Taylor Act)
Senate 1/20/2022 1/20/2022 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/25/2022 2/25/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/25/2022 2/20/2022 Favorable with Amendments {193226/1 Adopted 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/25/2022 2/20/2022 Floor Amendment {953521/1 (Senator Elfreth) Adopted 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/25/2022 2/20/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Environment – PFAS Chemicals – Prohibitions and Requirements (George “Walter” Taylor Act)
Senate 3/01/2022 2/21/2022 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 33BClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/02/2022 2/26/2022 Referred Health and Government Operations 19 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/23/2022 3/23/2022 Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Favorable with Amendments {913720/1 Adopted 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/31/2022 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 3/31/2022 Senate Concurs House Amendments 71 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 3/31/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 71 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 3/31/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Environment – PFAS Chemicals – Prohibitions and Requirements (George “Walter” Taylor Act)
Post Passage 4/21/2022 4/21/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 139
Text - Chapter - Environment – PFAS Chemicals – Prohibitions and Requirements (George “Walter” Taylor Act)
Last Updated: 6/23/2022 2:16 PM
Click to return on the top page