Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Earnable Compensation, Nonvested Former Members, and Immediate Vesting
Sponsored by
Senator Jackson (Chair, Joint Committee on Pensions)
Status
In the House - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Board of Trustees for the State Retirement and Pension System to pay a nonvested former member's accumulated contributions to the nonvested former member's designated beneficiary or estate if the nonvested former member dies before withdrawing the member's contributions; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0541
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2023
Legislative Date
1/26/2023
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2023
Legislative Date
1/26/2023
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2023
Legislative Date
3/08/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2023
Legislative Date
3/03/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments {993424/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2023
Legislative Date
3/03/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2023
Legislative Date
3/04/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
41AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2023
Legislative Date
3/05/2023
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2023
Legislative Date
3/20/2023
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2023
Legislative Date
3/30/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2023
Legislative Date
3/19/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments {453428/1 Adopted
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2023
Legislative Date
3/19/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2023 1/26/2023 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - State Retirement and Pension System - Nonvested Former Members - Return of Accumulated Contributions
Senate 1/26/2023 1/26/2023 Hearing 2/02 at 9:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2023 3/08/2023 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/09/2023 3/03/2023 Favorable with Amendments {993424/1 Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2023 3/03/2023 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Retirement and Pension System - Earnable Compensation, Nonvested Former Members, and Immediate Vesting
Senate 3/13/2023 3/04/2023 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 41AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2023 3/05/2023 Referred Appropriations 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2023 3/20/2023 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2023 3/30/2023 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/30/2023 3/19/2023 Favorable with Amendments {453428/1 Adopted 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2023 3/19/2023 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 3/30/2023 10:31 AM
Click to return on the top page