Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Sheriff's Sales - Procedures and Subordinate Interests
Sponsored by
Senator McKay
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that a sheriff's sale of real property extinguishes subordinate liens on the land being sold; and providing that certain provisions of the Act do not impair a lien on land affected by a judgment in favor of a local government for real property maintenance violations or nuisance condition violations that is indexed and recorded in accordance with the Maryland Rules.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0729
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2023
Legislative Date
1/26/2023
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2023
Legislative Date
1/26/2023
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2023
Legislative Date
2/27/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2023
Legislative Date
2/25/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments {443426/1 Adopted
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2023
Legislative Date
2/25/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Real Property - Sheriff's Sales - Procedures and Subordinate Interests
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2023
Legislative Date
2/27/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2023
Legislative Date
2/28/2023
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2023
Legislative Date
3/22/2023
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2023 1/26/2023 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2023 1/26/2023 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Real Property – Sheriff’s Sales – Notice, Procedures, and Subordinate Interests
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/27/2023 2/27/2023 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/28/2023 2/25/2023 Favorable with Amendments {443426/1 Adopted 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/28/2023 2/25/2023 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Real Property - Sheriff's Sales - Procedures and Subordinate Interests
Senate 3/02/2023 2/27/2023 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/03/2023 2/28/2023 Referred Judiciary 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2023 3/22/2023 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 3/22/2023 3:26 PM
Click to return on the top page