Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Department of Education and Maryland Department of Health - Maryland School-Based Health Center Standards - Telehealth
Sponsored by
Senator Kagan
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/20 at 3:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Education and the Maryland Department of Health to authorize a certain health care practitioner at an approved school-based health center to provide health care services through telehealth under certain circumstances; prohibiting the State Department of Education and the Maryland Department of Health from establishing certain requirements for a certain school-based health center to provide health care services through telehealth; etc.
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0034
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/08/2020
Legislative Date
10/08/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/29/2020
Legislative Date
12/29/2020
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2021
Legislative Date
1/06/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2021
Legislative Date
1/06/2021
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 10/08/2020 10/08/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 12/29/2020 12/29/2020 Hearing 1/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 1/06/2021 1/06/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/06/2021 1/06/2021 Hearing 1/20 at 3:00 p.m.
Text - First - State Department of Education and Maryland Department of Health - Maryland School-Based Health Center Standards - Telehealth
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/19/2021 9:25 AM