Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax Assessment - Appeals to Maryland Tax Court - Filing Fee
Sponsored by
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee (By Request - Departmental - Assessments and Taxation)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a taxpayer, when filing an appeal to the Maryland Tax Court of a property tax assessment for income-producing property valued greater than $5,000,000, to pay a $100 nonrefundable fee to the Maryland Tax Court.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0174
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/10/2023
Legislative Date
9/10/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Property Tax Assessment - Appeals to Maryland Tax Court - Filing Fee
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2024
Legislative Date
1/09/2024
Action
Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/10/2023 9/10/2023 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Property Tax Assessment - Appeals to Maryland Tax Court - Filing Fee
Senate 1/09/2024 1/09/2024 Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 1:42 PM
Click to return on the top page