Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Cecil County - Sales and Use Tax Exemption - Federal Facilities Redevelopment Areas
Sponsored by
Senators Gallion, Hershey, and Peters
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 282
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing an exemption from the sales and use tax for certain construction material or warehousing equipment purchased for use in a certain federal facilities redevelopment area in Cecil County under certain circumstances; requiring a buyer claiming the exemption to provide to the vendor evidence of eligibility issued by the Comptroller; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0582
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/17/2020
Legislative Date
9/17/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {389836/1 (Senator Gallion) Adopted
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/18/2021
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
4/07/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-4)
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/18/2021
Legislative Date
5/18/2021
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 282
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/17/2020 9/17/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Cecil County - Sales and Use Tax Exemption - Federal Facilities Redevelopment Areas
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Favorable Adopted 10 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Floor Amendment {389836/1 (Senator Gallion) Adopted 10 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 10 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Cecil County - Sales and Use Tax Exemption - Federal Facilities Redevelopment Areas
Senate 2/16/2021 2/11/2021 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 12 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/18/2021 2/18/2021 Referred Ways and Means 13 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/01/2021 3/01/2021 Hearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2021 4/07/2021 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/07/2021 3/22/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2021 3/23/2021 Third Reading Passed (133-4) 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/18/2021 Returned Passed 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/18/2021 5/18/2021 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 282
Text - Chapter - Cecil County - Sales and Use Tax Exemption - Federal Facilities Redevelopment Areas
(   11-241 )
Last Updated: 5/21/2021 12:26 PM
Click to return on the top page