Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Grocery Stores and Restaurants - Automated External Defibrillator Program (Joe Sheya Act)
Sponsored by
Senators Kramer, Feldman, Beidle, Jennings, Zucker, Smith, Klausmeier, Hershey, Guzzone, Lam, Gile, and Hettleman
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the owners and operators of certain grocery stores and restaurants with annual gross incomes above $1,000,000, beginning January 1, 2025, to place an automated external defibrillator in a certain area and maintain the functionality of the automated external defibrillator; granting certain immunities to grocery stores, restaurants, and individuals under certain circumstances; altering the definition of "facility" for the purpose of excluding certain restaurants and grocery stores from a certain program; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0288
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0434 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2023
Legislative Date
1/27/2023
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2023
Legislative Date
1/28/2023
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2023
Legislative Date
3/17/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2023
Legislative Date
3/09/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments {243528/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2023
Legislative Date
3/09/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2023
Legislative Date
3/11/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (38-5)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2023
Legislative Date
3/13/2023
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations Economic Matters
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2023
Legislative Date
3/22/2023
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2023 1/27/2023 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Food Service Facilities - Automated External Defibrillator Program (Joe Sheya Act)
Senate 1/28/2023 1/28/2023 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2023 3/17/2023 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/17/2023 3/09/2023 Favorable with Amendments {243528/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2023 3/09/2023 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Grocery Stores and Restaurants - Automated External Defibrillator Program (Joe Sheya Act)
Senate 3/20/2023 3/11/2023 Third Reading Passed (38-5) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2023 3/13/2023 Referred Health and Government Operations Economic Matters 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2023 3/22/2023 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
(   21-330.3 )
Last Updated: 3/24/2023 7:57 AM
Click to return on the top page