Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations - Nurse Anesthetists - Drug Authority and Collaboration
Sponsored by
Senator Reilly
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a nurse anesthetist to prescribe, order, and administer drugs, including controlled dangerous substances, without obtaining approval from a practitioner with whom the nurse anesthetist collaborates, subject to certain limitations; and authorizing a nurse anesthetist to collaborate with a podiatrist.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2022
Legislative Date
1/20/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2022
Legislative Date
1/25/2022
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/08/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2022 1/20/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Health Occupations - Nurse Anesthetists - Drug Authority and Collaboration
Senate 1/25/2022 1/25/2022 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/08/2022 2/08/2022 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/22/2022 2/22/2022 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 4/5/2022 5:44 AM
Click to return on the top page