Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Wiretap and Electronic Surveillance Reform Workgroup
Sponsored by
Senator Folden
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Wiretap and Electronic Surveillance Reform Workgroup to study the effectiveness of Maryland's wiretapping and electronic surveillance laws, examine current technologies, and examine ways to make certain audio and visual recordings more available; and requiring the Workgroup to report its final findings and recommendations regarding revisions to Maryland's wiretapping and electronic surveillance laws to the Governor and General Assembly on or before December 1, 2025.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0754 Session: 2023 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2024
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2024
Legislative Date
1/11/2024
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Wiretap and Electronic Surveillance Reform Workgroup
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2024
Legislative Date
1/15/2024
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2024
Legislative Date
1/18/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2024
Legislative Date
2/05/2024
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/11/2024 1/11/2024 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Maryland Wiretap and Electronic Surveillance Reform Workgroup
Senate 1/15/2024 1/15/2024 Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/18/2024 1/18/2024 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/05/2024 2/05/2024 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/2/2024 5:12 PM
Click to return on the top page