Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Board of Revenue Estimates and Bureau of Revenue Estimates - Organization and Operations
Sponsored by
Senators McCray and Elfreth
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 655
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Comptroller to appoint the Chief of the Bureau of Revenue Estimates from a list of at least three candidates reviewed and evaluated by the Revenue Monitoring Committee and the Consensus Revenue Monitoring and Forecasting Group; requiring a certain report of estimated state revenues to be reviewed and approved by the Committee before the estimates are formally adopted; requiring the Bureau to submit the March revenue report to the Board of Revenue Estimates by a certain date; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0113
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/27/2020
Legislative Date
10/27/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2021
Legislative Date
1/11/2021
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2021
Legislative Date
2/24/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2021
Legislative Date
2/15/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {879138/1 Adopted
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2021
Legislative Date
2/15/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/17/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
18AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Referred Ways and Means Appropriations
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Hearing canceled (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
4/05/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (108-28)
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 655
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/27/2020 10/27/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Board of Revenue Estimates and Bureau of Revenue Estimates - Organization and Operations
Senate 1/11/2021 1/11/2021 Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/24/2021 2/24/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/24/2021 2/15/2021 Favorable with Amendments {879138/1 Adopted 16 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/24/2021 2/15/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 16 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Board of Revenue Estimates and Bureau of Revenue Estimates - Organization and Operations
Senate 3/02/2021 2/17/2021 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 18AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/03/2021 2/27/2021 Referred Ways and Means Appropriations 18 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2021 3/08/2021 Hearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m. (Ways and Means)
House 3/22/2021 3/22/2021 Hearing canceled (Ways and Means)
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2021 4/05/2021 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/05/2021 3/20/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 39 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2021 3/21/2021 Third Reading Passed (108-28) 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2021 3/15/2021 Returned Passed 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 655
Last Updated: 6/2/2021 5:37 PM
Click to return on the top page