Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class C Veterans' Organization or Club License
Sponsored by
Senator Carozza
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 10:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the holder of a Class C (veterans' organization or club) license in Somerset County to purchase alcoholic beverages from a retail dealer.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0443
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2024
Legislative Date
1/12/2024
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2024
Legislative Date
2/05/2024
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/14/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/14/2024
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 10:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/12/2024 1/12/2024 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class C Veterans' Organization or Club License
Senate 2/05/2024 2/05/2024 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/14/2024 2/14/2024 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/14/2024 2/14/2024 Hearing 2/23 at 10:00 a.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 1:44 PM
Click to return on the top page