Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Police Retirement System and Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System - Deferred Retirement Option Program - Alterations
Sponsored by
Senator Jackson
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Increasing the maximum number of years of eligibility service that certain members of the State Police Retirement System or Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System may have to participate in the Deferred Retirement Option Program (DROP) from 30 to 32; increasing the number of years that certain members of the State Police Retirement System or Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System may participate in the DROP from 5 to 7; and authorizing certain individuals to elect to extend their participation in the DROP.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1422
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2022
Legislative Date
1/21/2022
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2022
Legislative Date
1/25/2022
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {633320/1 Adopted
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/17/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/21/2022
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2022 1/21/2022 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - State Police Retirement System - Deferred Retirement Option Program - Alterations
Senate 1/25/2022 1/25/2022 Hearing 2/10 at 9:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2022 3/29/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/29/2022 3/16/2022 Favorable with Amendments {633320/1 Adopted 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2022 3/16/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Police Retirement System and Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System - Deferred Retirement Option Program - Alterations
Senate 3/29/2022 3/17/2022 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2022 3/21/2022 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 42AClick to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:54 PM
Click to return on the top page