Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Virtual Education - Requirements
Sponsored by
Senators Pinsky, Patterson, Lam, Washington, and Kagan
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a teacher preparation program to include certain training related to teaching in a virtual learning environment as a component of instruction; providing that a county board of education may authorize a county superintendent of schools, under certain circumstances, to provide virtual education days to students instead of closing the public schools in the county because of severe weather conditions; requiring the county board to publish the plan for the use of virtual instruction on the school system's website; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2022
Legislative Date
1/21/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Primary and Secondary Education - Virtual Schools - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2022
Legislative Date
2/02/2022
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {373022/1
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {373022/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {363424/1 (Senator Eckardt) Rejected (17-27)
Proceedings
44AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {343524/1 (Senator Eckardt) Rejected
Proceedings
44AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Primary and Secondary Education - Virtual Schools - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (31-15)
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {713827/1 Adopted
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {683129/1 (Delegate Ghrist) Rejected (44-92)
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (94-42)
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
72 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (33-14)
Proceedings
72 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Primary and Secondary Education - Virtual Education- Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/27/2022
Legislative Date
5/27/2022
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2022 1/21/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Primary and Secondary Education - Virtual Schools - Revisions
Senate 2/02/2022 2/02/2022 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2022 3/15/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/15/2022 3/03/2022 Favorable with Amendments {373022/1 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2022 3/03/2022 Motion Laid Over (Senator Hershey) Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Favorable with Amendments {373022/1 Adopted 44AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Floor Amendment {363424/1 (Senator Eckardt) Rejected (17-27) 44AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Floor Amendment {343524/1 (Senator Eckardt) Rejected 44AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Primary and Secondary Education - Virtual Schools - Revisions
Senate 3/17/2022 3/05/2022 Third Reading Passed (31-15) 45AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2022 3/16/2022 Referred Ways and Means 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/23/2022 3/23/2022 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/09/2022 4/02/2022 Favorable with Amendments {713827/1 Adopted 54 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2022 4/02/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Floor Amendment {683129/1 (Delegate Ghrist) Rejected (44-92) 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Third Reading Passed (94-42) 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/01/2022 Senate Concurs House Amendments 72 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/01/2022 Third Reading Passed (33-14) 72 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/01/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Primary and Secondary Education - Virtual Education- Requirements
Post Passage 5/27/2022 5/27/2022 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Age
Last Updated: 6/23/2022 3:29 PM
Click to return on the top page