Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Rabies Vaccination Information - Submission to Local Agencies and Use for Licensing
Sponsored by
Senator Madaleno
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring, under specified circumstances, a licensed veterinarian who vaccinates a dog, cat, or ferret against rabies to send to a specified local agency specified rabies vaccination information; requiring the licensed veterinarian to send the information within 45 days after a vaccination certificate is completed; establishing a specified penalty; requiring a local agency to forward the information to another local agency under specified circumstances; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0432
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2017
Legislative Date
1/26/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Conway) Adopted
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2017 1/26/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Public Health - Rabies Vaccination Information - Submission to Local Agencies and Use for Licensing
Senate 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Conway) Adopted 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable Adopted 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Second Reading Passed 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Health - Rabies Vaccination Information - Submission to Local Agencies and Use for Licensing
Senate 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Referred Health and Government Operations 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page