Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Teacher Development and Retention Program - Alterations
Sponsored by
Senator King
Status
In the House - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "institution of initial eligibility" to include community colleges as eligible institutions as part of the criteria for applicants for the Teacher Development and Retention Program.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0075
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2024
Legislative Date
1/17/2024
Action
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2024
Legislative Date
1/25/2024
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2024
Legislative Date
2/17/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2024
Legislative Date
2/17/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/29/2024
Legislative Date
2/19/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/29/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {553926/1 Adopted
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
3/18/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/18/2024
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/18/2024
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/18/2024
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators M. Washington, Lewis Young and Carozza)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators M. Washington, Lewis Young and Carozza)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
House Refuses Recede
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Smith, Wolek and Ghrist)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
House Refuses Recede
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Smith, Wolek and Ghrist)
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/24/2024
Action
Conference Committee Report {883027/1 Adopted
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/24/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Conference Committee Report {883027/1 Adopted
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/24/2024
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2024 1/17/2024 First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Text - First - Higher Education - Teacher Development and Retention Program - Definition
Senate 1/25/2024 1/25/2024 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2024 2/26/2024 Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 2/27/2024 2/17/2024 Favorable Adopted 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/27/2024 2/17/2024 Second Reading Passed 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Higher Education - Teacher Development and Retention Program - Definition
Senate 2/29/2024 2/19/2024 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 35 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/01/2024 2/26/2024 Referred Appropriations 36 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2024 3/20/2024 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/20/2024 3/20/2024 Hearing canceled
House 3/20/2024 3/20/2024 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2024 3/29/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/29/2024 3/16/2024 Favorable with Amendments {553926/1 Adopted 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2024 3/16/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2024 3/18/2024 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2024 3/18/2024 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2024 3/18/2024 Senate Requests House Recede 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2024 3/18/2024 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators M. Washington, Lewis Young and Carozza) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2024 3/23/2024 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2024 3/23/2024 Senate Requests House Recede 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2024 3/23/2024 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators M. Washington, Lewis Young and Carozza) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2024 3/23/2024 House Refuses Recede 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2024 3/23/2024 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Smith, Wolek and Ghrist) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2024 3/20/2024 House Refuses Recede 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2024 3/20/2024 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Smith, Wolek and Ghrist) 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/24/2024 Conference Committee Report {883027/1 Adopted 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/24/2024 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 69 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/27/2024 Conference Committee Report {883027/1 Adopted 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/27/2024 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/24/2024 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Higher Education - Teacher Development and Retention Program - Alterations
Last Updated: 4/15/2024 3:19 PM
Click to return on the top page