Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations - Licensing of Audiology Assistants
Sponsored by
Senator Lam
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 714
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring, on or after October 1, 2022, an individual to be licensed by the State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, and Speech-Language Pathologists before assisting in the practice of audiology in the State, except as otherwise provided under certain provisions of law; establishing qualifications to obtain an audiology assistant license; authorizing a licensed audiologist to provide general supervision for up to two licensed audiology assistants at any time; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0161
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health Occupations - Registration of Audiology Assistants
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {204132/1 Adopted
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Health Occupations - Licensing of Audiology Assistants
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
4/05/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {606887/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-2)
Proceedings
41AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Health Occupations - Licensing of Audiology Assistants
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 714
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Health Occupations - Registration of Audiology Assistants
Senate 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2021 3/12/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/16/2021 2/25/2021 Favorable with Amendments {204132/1 Adopted 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2021 2/25/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Health Occupations - Licensing of Audiology Assistants
Senate 3/17/2021 2/26/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 27 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/06/2021 Referred Health and Government Operations 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2021 4/05/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2021 3/21/2021 Favorable with Amendments {606887/1 Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2021 3/21/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2021 3/22/2021 Third Reading Passed (135-2) 41AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2021 3/19/2021 Senate Concurs House Amendments 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2021 3/19/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2021 3/19/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Health Occupations - Licensing of Audiology Assistants
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 714
Last Updated: 6/2/2021 5:39 PM
Click to return on the top page