Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Stay of Eviction Proceeding for Rental Assistance Determination
Sponsored by
Senator Hettleman
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing for the stay of certain eviction proceedings when a tenant is waiting for a determination regarding the tenant's good faith application for rental assistance.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0674
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2022
Legislative Date
1/24/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2022
Legislative Date
1/26/2022
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/06/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {373323/1
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/06/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Hettleman) Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/06/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {373323/1
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/06/2022
Action
Committee Amendment Withdrawn
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/06/2022
Action
Substitute Committee Amendment {783022/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/06/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/06/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (33-14)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (95-38)
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/27/2022
Legislative Date
5/27/2022
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2022 1/24/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Landlord and Tenant - Stay of Eviction Proceeding for Rental Assistance Determination
Senate 1/26/2022 1/26/2022 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/18/2022 3/06/2022 Favorable with Amendments {373323/1 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/06/2022 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Hettleman) Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/06/2022 Favorable with Amendments {373323/1 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/06/2022 Committee Amendment Withdrawn 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/06/2022 Substitute Committee Amendment {783022/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/06/2022 Favorable with Amendments Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/06/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Landlord and Tenant - Stay of Eviction Proceeding for Rental Assistance Determination
Senate 3/21/2022 3/08/2022 Third Reading Passed (33-14) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2022 3/14/2022 Referred Environment and Transportation 35 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/23/2022 3/23/2022 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2022 3/31/2022 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/31/2022 3/25/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2022 3/26/2022 Third Reading Passed (95-38) 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2022 3/23/2022 Returned Passed 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/27/2022 5/27/2022 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Statutes
Last Updated: 5/31/2022 5:12 PM
Click to return on the top page