Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Code Revision - Estates and Trusts
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Department of Legislative Services - Code Revision)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 197
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Revising, restating, and recodifying the laws of this State relating to estates and trusts; clarifying language; making certain technical and stylistic changes; providing for the construction of the Act; and authorizing the publisher of the Annotated Code to make certain corrections in a certain manner.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Code Revision - Estates and Trusts
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {738979/1 Adopted
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Code Revision - Estates and Trusts
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/17/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-0)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 197
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Code Revision - Estates and Trusts
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Code Revision - Estates and Trusts
Senate 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Hearing 2/19 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Favorable with Amendments {738979/1 Adopted 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Code Revision - Estates and Trusts
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Referred Health and Government Operations 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2019 3/21/2019 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/22/2019 3/17/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 52 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/25/2019 3/18/2019 Third Reading Passed (130-0) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/26/2019 3/22/2019 Returned Passed 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 197
Text - Chapter - Code Revision - Estates and Trusts
(   10-101, 10-102, 10-104, 1-101, 1-103, 1-105, 11-101, 11-103, 11-105, 11-108, 1-202, 1-203, 1-206, 1-207, 1-208, 1-209, 1-210, 12-102, 12-103, 13-101, 13-102, 13-106, 13-201, 13-203, 13-205, 13-206, 13-207, 13-208, 13-211, 13-212, 13-214, 13-215, 13-216, 13-217, 13-218, 13-219, 13-220, 13-221, 13-222, 13-302, 13-401, 13-405, 13-406, 13-407, 13-501, 13-503, 13-701, 13-702, 13-703, 13-705, 13-707, 13-708, 13-709, 13-801, 13-802, 13-803, 13-804, 13-805, 13-806, 1-401, 14-302, 14-304, 15-102, 15-103, 15-104, 15-105, 15-108, 15-110, 15-111, 15-112, 15-202 through 15-208, 15-301, 15-302, 15-303, 15-304, 15-305, 15-502, 15-503, 15-504, 15-505, 15-506, 15-507, 15-509, 15-510, 15-512, 15-513, 15-514, 15-516, 15-518, 15-519, 15-521, 15-522, 15-523, 16-101, 16-102, 16-103, 16-106, 16-107, 16-108, 16-110, 2-102, 2-105, 2-106, 2-107, 2-108, 2-202, 2-204, 2-205, 2-207, 2-208, 2-301, 2-302, 2-303, 3-101, 3-104, 3-106, 3-108, 3-109, 3-110, 3-203, 3-204, 3-205, 3-207, 3-208, 3-301, 3-302, 3-303, 4-101, 4-102, 4-104, 4-105, 4-201, 4-202, 4-401, 4-402, 4-405, 4-406, 4-409, 4-410, 5-102, 5-103, 5-105, 5-106, 5-201, 5-204, 5-205, 5-207, 5-301, 5-302, 5-304, 5-401, 5-402, 5-403, 5-404, 5-502, 5-503, 5-504, 5-602, 5-603, 5-604, 6-101, 6-102, 6-103, 6-105, 6-201, 6-203, 6-204, 6-302, 6-303, 6-304, 6-306, 6-308, 6-401, 6-403, 6-404, 7-101, 7-102, 7-103, 7-103.1, 7-104, 7-105, 7-201, 7-203, 7-204, 7-205, 7-301, 7-306, 7-307, 7-401, 7-402, 7-403, 7-404, 7-501, 7-502, 7-601, 7-602, 7-603, 8-103, 8-104, 8-105, 8-106, 8-107, 8-108, 8-109, 8-110, 8-111, 8-112, 8-114, 9-102, 9-103, 9-104, 9-106, 9-107, 9-109, 9-111, 9-112, 9-201, 9-202, 9-203, 9-204 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page