Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Landlord-Tenant - Nonrenewal of Lease - Notice Requirements
Sponsored by
Senator Carter
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 803
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the period of time prior to the expiration of a tenancy that a landlord is required to notify a tenant, in writing, of the intent to terminate a tenancy upon expiration, under certain circumstances and subject to certain conditions; applying the notice provisions statewide; and applying the Act to any residential lease executed in the State on or after October 1, 2021, and, beginning October 1, 2021, to any residential lease executed before October 1, 2021, that has expired and resulted in a certain tenancy on or after October 1, 2021.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0104
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2021
Legislative Date
1/18/2021
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Landlord-Tenant - Nonrenewal of Lease - Notice Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {108076/1
Proceedings
28AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted
Proceedings
28AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {108076/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {203823/1 (Senator Waldstreicher) Adopted
Proceedings
28BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Landlord-Tenant - Nonrenewal of Lease - Notice Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (30-15)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
4/10/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {730817/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/27/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (94-44)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Carter) Adopted
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/25/2021
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/25/2021
Action
Motion Limit Debate (Senator King) Adopted (32-15)
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/25/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (30-16)
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/25/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Landlord-Tenant - Nonrenewal of Lease - Notice Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 803
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/18/2021 1/18/2021 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Landlord-Tenant - Nonrenewal of Lease - Notice Requirements
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2021 3/17/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/18/2021 2/27/2021 Favorable with Amendments {108076/1 28AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2021 2/27/2021 Motion Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted 28AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 2/28/2021 Favorable with Amendments {108076/1 Adopted 28BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 2/28/2021 Floor Amendment {203823/1 (Senator Waldstreicher) Adopted 28BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 2/28/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28BClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Landlord-Tenant - Nonrenewal of Lease - Notice Requirements
Senate 3/19/2021 3/01/2021 Third Reading Passed (30-15) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Referred Environment and Transportation 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 4/10/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 Favorable with Amendments {730817/1 Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/27/2021 Third Reading Passed (94-44) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/24/2021 Senate Concurs House Amendments 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/24/2021 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Carter) Adopted 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/25/2021 Senate Concurs House Amendments 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/25/2021 Motion Limit Debate (Senator King) Adopted (32-15) 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/25/2021 Third Reading Passed (30-16) 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/25/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Landlord-Tenant - Nonrenewal of Lease - Notice Requirements
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 803
Last Updated: 6/2/2021 5:43 PM
Click to return on the top page