Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Opioid Restitution Fund - Appropriation of Settlement Funds and Grant Program
Sponsored by
Senators Feldman, Benson, Beidle, and Klausmeier
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 85
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the appropriation of certain funds from the Opioid Restitution Fund to be made in accordance with certain settlement agreements; requiring the Secretary of Health to establish and administer a grant program for the distribution of certain opioid restitution funds to political subdivisions in accordance with a certain agreement; and requiring the Attorney General to identify and designate the controlling version of the settlement agreements.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1086
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2022
Legislative Date
1/26/2022
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Opioid Restitution Fund - Appropriation of Settlement Funds
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {243129/1
Proceedings
33BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted
Proceedings
33BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {243129/1
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/3 (Senator Hough) Adopted
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2022
Legislative Date
2/24/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {243129/1 Adopted
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2022
Legislative Date
2/24/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Opioid Restitution Fund - Appropriation of Settlement Funds
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/26/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:40 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/12/2022
Legislative Date
4/12/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 85
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2022 1/26/2022 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Opioid Restitution Fund - Appropriation of Settlement Funds
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/28/2022 2/28/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/01/2022 2/21/2022 Favorable with Amendments {243129/1 33BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/01/2022 2/21/2022 Motion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted 33BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2022 2/22/2022 Favorable with Amendments {243129/1 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2022 2/22/2022 Motion Special Order until 3/3 (Senator Hough) Adopted 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2022 2/24/2022 Favorable with Amendments {243129/1 Adopted 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2022 2/24/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Opioid Restitution Fund - Appropriation of Settlement Funds
Senate 3/08/2022 2/26/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2022 3/03/2022 Referred Appropriations 24 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2022 3/13/2022 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing canceled
House 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 3/22 at 1:40 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2022 4/05/2022 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/05/2022 3/27/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 48AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2022 3/28/2022 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Returned Passed 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/12/2022 4/12/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 85
Text - Chapter - Opioid Restitution Fund - Appropriation of Settlement Funds and Grant Program
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:56 PM
Click to return on the top page